MA S464 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2182
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-8)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation further regulating the enforcement of illegal hunting practices. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Further regulating the enforcement of illegal hunting practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2182 |
2017-04-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S997 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1364 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1010 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1304 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1130 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2637
S1466 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S161 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S974 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1256 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2182 (Replaced by) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2248
S1364 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1010 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1304 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1130 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2637
S1466 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S161 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S974 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1256 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2182 (Replaced by) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2248
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S464 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S464.pdf |