MA S974 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to injuries to law enforcement personnel by drivers under the influence of alcohol. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to injuries to law enforcement personnel by drivers under the influence of alcohol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1172 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1173 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1466 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1364 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1304 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S787 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
H998 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H606 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1173 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1466 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1364 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1304 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S787 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
H998 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H606 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S974 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S974.pdf |