MA S45 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the Gloucester city charter. Election Laws.
Title
Regulating preliminary elections in the city of Gloucester
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-04-06 | House | Enacted |
2016-04-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-09-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-09-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-09-08 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2042 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1059 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1801 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
S390 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S1552 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1953 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1957 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1513 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1883 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1923 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - New draft substituted, see S1933
S1947 (Similar To) 2015-10-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2015
S1059 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1801 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
S390 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S1552 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1953 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1957 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1513 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1883 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1923 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - New draft substituted, see S1933
S1947 (Similar To) 2015-10-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S45 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S45.pdf |