MA S425 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to ballot modernization. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to ballot modernization
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2544 |
2019-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S1803 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S581 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
H2808 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
S581 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
H2808 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S425 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S425.pdf |