MA S404 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote political participation. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting political participation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-05-03JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-05-03JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2019-05-02JointHearing rescheduled to 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-04-29JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S413 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H2445 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H651 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S424 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback