MA S379 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2243

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation for a United States constitutional amendment and amendments convention. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For a United States constitutional amendment and amendments convention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2243
2017-12-28HouseHouse concurred
2017-12-26SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
2017-10-04JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S401 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1816 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H65 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 25, 2018
H61 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 25, 2018
H63 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 25, 2018
H64 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 25, 2018
H1929 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H60 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Placed on file
H59 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 25, 2018
S1775 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H4115 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Senate concurred
S2243 (Replaced by) 2018-06-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback