MA H63 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - No further action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - No further action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Mark of Peru, a petition of Paul W. Mark and others for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to declare rights afforded to the human inhabitants of the Commonwealth are not applicable to corporations, limited liability companies or any other corporate entities. The Judiciary.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to declare that corporations are not people, money is not speech
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Joint | No further action |
2018-12-31 | Joint | Joint session held and dissolved |
2018-07-25 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Monday, December 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 25, 2018 |
2017-11-08 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, May 9, 2018 |
2017-06-14 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, November 8, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, June 14, 2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on file |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2017-04-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S12 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Placed on file
S11 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
S379 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2243
S13 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Placed on file
S14 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H65 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H60 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Placed on file
S401 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H4115 (Similar To) 2018-11-06 - Approved by the People at the state election, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2018
S2243 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S11 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
S379 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2243
S13 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Placed on file
S14 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H65 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H60 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Placed on file
S401 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H4115 (Similar To) 2018-11-06 - Approved by the People at the state election, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2018
S2243 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H63 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H63.pdf |