MA S352 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2558
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to home care workforce initiatives. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to home care workforce initiatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2558 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 15, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S351 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S343 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S364 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H82 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
H341 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2068 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-11-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2017
S2558 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - House concurred
S343 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S364 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H82 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
H341 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2068 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-11-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2017
S2558 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S352 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S352.pdf |