MA S343 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2419

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a home care aide training registry. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a home care aide training registry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2419
2017-07-18JointHearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S369 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
S351 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S352 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
S31 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S364 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S1351 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H82 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
H341 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H734 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2098 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H1919 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H852 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H973 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-11-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2017
H3827 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4048 (Similar To) 2017-11-27 - See H3827
S2419 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback