MA S327 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2581

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to genocide education . Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning genocide education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2581
2019-09-27JointHearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H566 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4433
H2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2581 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback