MA S313 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2443

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to dyslexia. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to dyslexia

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2443
2017-07-05JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S294 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2443
S316 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S287 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H2233 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2872 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H4394 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2443 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback