MA S305 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2750
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2750
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2750
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote racially integrated schools. Education.
Title
Promoting racially integrated schools
Sponsors
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2750 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1421 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H1580 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S220 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
S352 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1562 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S918 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S342 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S253 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4714
S2750 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1299 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H1580 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S220 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
S352 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1562 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S918 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S342 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S253 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4714
S2750 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1299 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S305 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S305.pdf |