MA S297 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2664
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand dual enrollment for high school students in Gateway Cities. Education.
Title
To expand dual enrollment for high school students in Gateway Cities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2664 |
2023-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S362 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
S2664 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2664 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S297 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S297.pdf |