MA S2942 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2987
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2987
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting diversion of juveniles to community supervision and services
Title
Promoting diversion of juveniles to community supervision and services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #198 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Amendment 10 Roll Call #197 (Y: 6 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Amendment 8 Roll Call #196 (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Amendment 7 Roll Call #195 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Amendment 10 Roll Call #197 (Y: 6 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Amendment 8 Roll Call #196 (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Amendment 7 Roll Call #195 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Reprinted, as amended, see S2987 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Substituted, as amended for S2836 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #197 (Yeas 6 to Nays 33) |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #196 (Yeas 12 to Nays 26) |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) rejected |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #195 (Yeas 9 to Nays 30) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2836 |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
Same As/Similar To
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S984 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2836
S2836 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2942
H1569 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2836
H220 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S984 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2836
S2836 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2942
H1569 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2836
H220 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909