MA S2915 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Laid before the Govenor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Laid before the Govenor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Scituate to use certain conservation land for general municipal purposes
Title
Authorizing the town of Scituate to use certain conservation land for general municipal purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-05 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #477 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | Senate | Laid before the Govenor |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #477 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 462) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-01-04 | House | Read third, amended by substitution of a new text (H5236) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-11-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-11-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-09-28 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Substituted for S2300 |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Recommended new draft (O'Connor) for S2300 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2915 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2915.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/191/SenateRollCall477.pdf |