MA S2896 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Lunenburg to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises to Jaxx Country Variety. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Lunenburg to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises to Jaxx Country Variety
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Tran [R] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] | Rep. Danillo Sena [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-08-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday January 5, 2021, pending concurrence |
2020-08-17 | House | House concurred |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2896.pdf |