MA S288 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2883
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to universal prekindergarten access. Education.
Title
Relative to universal prekindergarten access
Sponsors
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2883 |
2022-05-16 | House | House concurred |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Monday May 23, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday May 23, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday May 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday May 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2883 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
H3729 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H714 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
H3729 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H714 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S288 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S288.pdf |