MA S2872 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2901
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-29 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2901
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-29 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2901
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the release of parcels of land in the town of Raynham from certain restrictions. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the release of parcels of land in the town of Raynham from certain restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-29 | Senate | New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2901 |
2024-07-29 | Senate | Read third |
2024-07-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-07-24 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2024-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2024 from 12:55 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-07-15 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2892 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2933
S2901 (Replaced by) 2024-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2024
S2933 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
H4968 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Adopted
S2901 (Replaced by) 2024-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2024
S2933 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
H4968 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2872 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2872.pdf |