MA S2853 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to veterans and federal affairs.
Title
Veterans and Federal Affairs - Extension Order
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Adopted, in concurrence |
2022-05-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2639 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - House adopted, in concurrence
S2824 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - House adopted, in concurrence
S2824 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - House adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2853 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2853.pdf |