MA S2852 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to revive and continue the Fitchburg Area Economic Development Corporation. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Extending the duration of the Fitchburg Area Economic Development Corporation
Sponsors
Sen. John Cronin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-12-22 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-12-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-18 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2022-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2022-04-28 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Returned from the Secretary of State |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2852 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2852.pdf |