MA S2820 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-30 - For report, see S2963
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-30 - For report, see S2963
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reform police standards and shift resources to build a more equitable, fair and just commonwealth that values Black lives and communities of color
Title
To reform police standards and shift resources to build a more equitable, fair and just commonwealth that values Black lives and communities of color
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-24 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 226 (Y: 93 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - House - House On adoption of amendment #131 Yea and Nay No. 225 (Y: 47 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-24 - House - House on adoption Consolidated "C" Yea and Nay No. 224 (Y: 115 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - House - House On further amendment to Consol "C" Yea and Nay No. 223 (Y: 72 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-24 - House - House On further amendment to 195 Yea and Nay No. 222 (Y: 24 N: 135 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-24 - House - House On adoption of amendment #93 changed Yea and Nay No. 220 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - House - House on adoption Consolidated "B" Yea and Nay No. 218 (Y: 151 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #3 Yea and Nay No. 217 (Y: 55 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #174 Yea and Nay No. 216 (Y: 53 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #181 Yea and Nay No. 215 (Y: 68 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #169 Yea and Nay No. 214 (Y: 43 N: 115 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House on adoption Consolidated "A" Yea and Nay No. 212 (Y: 147 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #118 Yea and Nay No. 211 (Y: 44 N: 114 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #61 Yea and Nay No. 210 (Y: 45 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #58 Yea and Nay No. 209 (Y: 34 N: 124 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #77 Yea and Nay No. 208 (Y: 46 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #200 Yea and Nay No. 207 (Y: 38 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-22 - House - House On adoption of amendment #78 Yea and Nay No. 205 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House On adoption of amendment #11 Yea and Nay No. 204 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House On adoption of amendment #116 Yea and Nay No. 203 (Y: 83 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House On adoption of amendment #29 Yea and Nay No. 202 (Y: 44 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-24 - House - House On adoption of amendment #131 Yea and Nay No. 225 (Y: 47 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-24 - House - House on adoption Consolidated "C" Yea and Nay No. 224 (Y: 115 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - House - House On further amendment to Consol "C" Yea and Nay No. 223 (Y: 72 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-24 - House - House On further amendment to 195 Yea and Nay No. 222 (Y: 24 N: 135 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-24 - House - House On adoption of amendment #93 changed Yea and Nay No. 220 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - House - House on adoption Consolidated "B" Yea and Nay No. 218 (Y: 151 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #3 Yea and Nay No. 217 (Y: 55 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #174 Yea and Nay No. 216 (Y: 53 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #181 Yea and Nay No. 215 (Y: 68 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #169 Yea and Nay No. 214 (Y: 43 N: 115 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House on adoption Consolidated "A" Yea and Nay No. 212 (Y: 147 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #118 Yea and Nay No. 211 (Y: 44 N: 114 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #61 Yea and Nay No. 210 (Y: 45 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #58 Yea and Nay No. 209 (Y: 34 N: 124 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #77 Yea and Nay No. 208 (Y: 46 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-23 - House - House On adoption of amendment #200 Yea and Nay No. 207 (Y: 38 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-22 - House - House On adoption of amendment #78 Yea and Nay No. 205 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House On adoption of amendment #11 Yea and Nay No. 204 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House On adoption of amendment #116 Yea and Nay No. 203 (Y: 83 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House On adoption of amendment #29 Yea and Nay No. 202 (Y: 44 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | For report, see S2963 |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Reported by committee of conference |
2020-07-27 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Cronin-Gonzalez-Whelan), in concurrence |
2020-07-27 | House | House insisted on its amendment |
2020-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Committee on conference (Brownsberger - Chang-Diaz - Tarr) appointed |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the House amendment |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-24 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 93 YEAS to 66 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 226) |
2020-07-24 | House | For amendments, see H4886 |
2020-07-22 | House | Read third |
2020-07-20 | House | Order adopted, see H4861 |
2020-07-20 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending |
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-07-20 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 4860 |
2020-07-15 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Text of S2800, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4861 (Replaced by) 2020-07-20 - Adopted, see S2820
H4886 (Replaced by) 2020-07-27 - H4860, published as amended
S2963 (Replaced by) 2020-12-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 253 of the Acts of 2020
H4886 (Replaced by) 2020-07-27 - H4860, published as amended
S2963 (Replaced by) 2020-12-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 253 of the Acts of 2020