MA S280 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a creative economy master plan. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Creating a creative economy master plan
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S1229 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2007 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H3558 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2007 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H3558 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S280 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S280.pdf |