MA S2780 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1393
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - New draft substituted, see S3182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - New draft substituted, see S3182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to expand naloxone access, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2780).
Title
To expand access to Naloxone
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Public Health | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Jon Santiago [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S3182 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read second |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S3182 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-03-24 | Senate | New draft of S1393 and H2361 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1393 (Replaces) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2780
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S698 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
S1648 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2107 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S698 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
S1648 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2107 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2780 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2780.pdf |