MA S2769 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2796
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, June 18, 2020 -- The committee on Senate Ways and Means to whom was referred the Senate Bill advancing and expanding access to telemedicine services (Senate, No. 612) (also based on Senate, No. 596), - reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft entitled "An Act Putting Patients First" (Senate, No. 2769).
Title
Putting Patients First
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #203 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #202 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #201 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #200 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #202 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #201 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #200 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2796 |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #203 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #63 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #70 (Barrett) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #68 (Barrett) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #65 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #62 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #60 (Moran) adopted -see Roll Call #202 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #59 (Tarr) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #57 (Feeney) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #55 (Cyr) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #54 (Fattman) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #53 (Fattman) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #52 (Welch) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #47 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #46 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #45 (Welch) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #40 (Lewis) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #38 (Comerford) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #37 (Comerford) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #36 (Keenan) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #31 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #30 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #28 (Lewis) adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #27 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #25 (Tran) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Timilty) adopted -see Roll Call #201 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #16 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Tarr) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Tarr) adopted -see Roll Call #200 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Tran) rejected |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S612 |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
Same As/Similar To
S2796 (Replaces) 2020-12-22 - For report, see S2984