MA S2796 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4888
Note: Legislation replaced by S2984
Note: Legislation replaced by S2984
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-22 - For report, see S2984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-22 - For report, see S2984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Putting Patients First
Title
Putting Patients First
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-29 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 247 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - House - House On adoption of amendment #6 Yea and Nay No. 246 (Y: 62 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-29 - House - House On adoption of amendment #6 Yea and Nay No. 246 (Y: 62 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Senate | For report, see S2984 |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Reported by committee of conference |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee of conference House membership changed to (Mariano-Mahoney-R. Hunt) |
2020-07-31 | House | Committee of conference appointed, in concurrence - (Mariano-Cullinane-R. Hunt) |
2020-07-31 | House | House insisted on its amendment |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Committee on conference appointed (Friedman-Cyr-Tran) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Senate NON-concurred in the House amendment |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-29 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 247) |
2020-07-28 | House | Read third |
2020-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-27 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-27 | House | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted, see H4888 |
2020-07-27 | House | Amendment (H4871) rejected |
2020-07-27 | House | Read second |
2020-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendments pending |
2020-07-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendments pending |
2020-07-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 4888 |
2020-07-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending |
2020-07-22 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 4871 |
2020-07-09 | House | Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Text of S2769, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4888 (Replaced by) 2020-07-29 - Published as H4916
S2984 (Replaced by) 2021-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2020
S2984 (Replaced by) 2021-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2796 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2796.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/Journal/House/191/RollCalls/hj07292020_RollCalls.pdf |