MA S2746 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt the position of police chief in the town of Barnstable from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting the position of police chief in the town of Barnstable from the civil service law
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Kip Diggs [D] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2024-04-29 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4072 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2024
H2579 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2023
H2571 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2023
H4652 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Senate concurred
H2579 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2023
H2571 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2023
H4652 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2746 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2746.pdf |