MA S2731 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2900
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2900
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2900
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent COVID-19 deaths in senior living facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
To prevent COVID-19 deaths in senior living facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2900 |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday, August 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2020 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-06-01 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2900 (Replaced by) 2020-08-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2731 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2731.pdf |