MA S2715 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - Read third, amended by substitution of a new text (H5001) and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - Read third, amended by substitution of a new text (H5001) and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the charter of the town of Marshfield to make references to the board of selectmen gender neutral
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Marshfield to make references to the board of selectmen gender neutral
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | House | Read third, amended by substitution of a new text (H5001) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-05-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-10 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Substituted for S1317 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | New draft (O'Connor) of S1317 |
Same As/Similar To
H2074 (Similar To) 2023-07-03 - Accompanied S1317
S1317 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2715
H4025 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
H4108 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1317 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2715
H4025 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
H4108 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2715 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2715.pdf |