MA S2713 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to fairness in debt collection (Senate, No. 2638),- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2713).
Title
Relative to fairness in debt collection
Sponsors
Senate Senate Committee on Ways and Means | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #122 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #122 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Read third |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2638 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2638 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2638 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - New draft substituted, see S2713
H4429 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1107 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
S629 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H4429 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1107 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
S629 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2713 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2713.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/193/SenateRollCall122.pdf |