MA S2683 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1380
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to strengthen the public health infrastructure to address Alzheimer’s Disease and dementia, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2683).
Title
To strengthen our public health infrastructure to address Alzheimer’s and all dementia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2024-03-14 | Senate | New draft of S1380 and H2178 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1380 (Replaces) 2024-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2683
H2178 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2683
H558 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1508 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
S890 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H2178 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2683
H558 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1508 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
S890 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2683 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2683.pdf |