MA S2680 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to municipal governance during the COVID-19 emergency (being the text of Senate, No. 2673, printed as amended)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to municipal governance during the COVID-19 emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-04 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 183 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-05 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2020
2020-06-04SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-06-04HouseEnacted - 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 183)
2020-06-04SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2020-06-04HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2020-06-04SenateSenate concurred in the House still further amendment
2020-06-04HouseHouse concurred in the Senate further amendment with a still further amendment, striking all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of H4777
2020-06-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2020-06-01SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2733
2020-06-01SenateRules suspended
2020-05-26HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-05-26HouseRules suspended
2020-05-26HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading
2020-05-26HouseRules suspended
2020-05-26HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending
2020-05-26HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-05-26HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 4752
2020-05-07HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2020-05-04SenatePassed to be engrossed
2020-05-04SenateText of S2673, printed as amended

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback