MA S2644 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to collective bargaining dues
Title
Relative to collective bargaining dues
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-08-02 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S1047 |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1047 |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Reported form the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H1438 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1475 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Accompanied H1426
H1426 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1475 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Accompanied H1426
H1426 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2644 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2644.pdf |