MA S2632 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 218 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 218 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to veterans' benefits, rights, appreciation, validation and enforcement” (Senate, No. 2632).
Title
Relative to veterans' benefits, rights, appreciation, validation and enforcement
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-27 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 425 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-27 - House - House On Acceptance of the conference report Yea and Nay No. 422 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of conference report accepted Roll Call #484 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-27 - House - House On Acceptance of the conference report Yea and Nay No. 422 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of conference report accepted Roll Call #484 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 218 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-27 | House | Enacted - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 425) |
2018-07-27 | House | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 422) |
2018-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2018-07-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-27 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted -see Roll Call #484 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Reported on a part of S2509 |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee of conference |