MA S2599 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S907
Note: Replaces legislation S2621
Note: Replaces legislation S2621
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Reprinted as amended, see S2621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Reprinted as amended, see S2621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent human trafficking and sexual exploitation in bodyworks establishments,- reports the accompanying bill entitled "An Act to regulate bodywork therapy" (Senate, No. 2599).
Title
To regulate bodywork therapy
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-19 - Senate - Senate Passed to be engrossed Roll Call #456 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2621 |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read third |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #7 (L'Italien) adopted |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Montigny) adopted |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Brownsberger) adopted |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Brownsberger) adopted |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tran) adopted |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Keenan) adopted |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read second |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 19, 2018 |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2018-07-12 | Senate | New draft of S907 |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S907 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2599
S2598 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H766 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S906 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2598
S905 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2598
S1353 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2621 (Replaces) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2598 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H766 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S906 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2598
S905 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2598
S1353 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2621 (Replaces) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2599 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2599.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/190/SenateRollCall456.pdf |