MA S2621 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To regulate bodywork therapy
Title
To regulate bodywork therapy
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #456 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Text of S2599, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H766 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S907 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2599
S2598 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S907 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2599
S2598 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2621 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2621.pdf |