MA S2578 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1352
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize childhood lead poisoning prevention; and of Andres X. Vargas and others relative to childhood lead poisoning prevention, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2578).
Title
Modernizing childhood lead poisoning prevention
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Public Health | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Andres Vargas [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
Rep. Carol Doherty [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2024-02-09 | Senate | New draft of S1352 and H2280 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1352 (Replaces) 2024-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2578 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2578.pdf |