MA S1352 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2578
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize childhood lead poisoning prevention. Public Health.
Title
Modernizing childhood lead poisoning prevention
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2578 |
2023-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2578 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4507 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4507 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1352 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1352.pdf |