MA S2563 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to marijuana-related revenue in the town of Millbury. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to marijuana-related revenue in the town of Millbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-09-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-08-20 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-06-19 | House | House concurred |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3504 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1059 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1060 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H1052 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1059 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1060 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H1052 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2563 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2563.pdf |