MA S1059 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2488
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the use and legal effects of marijuana. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Relative to the use and legal effects of marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2488 |
2018-01-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S538 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3181 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3183 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1123 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1594 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H2057 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H2908 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2097 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - See H3776
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
S2488 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3181 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3183 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1123 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1594 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H2057 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H2908 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2097 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - See H3776
H3818 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2017
S2488 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1059 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1059.pdf |