MA S2562 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4510
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize Diana Grullon to take the civil service examination for the position of firefighter in the city of Haverhill notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing Diana Grullon to take the civil service examination for the position of firefighter in the city of Haverhill notwithstanding the maximum age requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Accompanied by H4510 |
2020-03-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2020 from 11:15 AM-12:15 PM in A-1 |
2020-02-26 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4510 (Replaces) 2020-04-13 - Accompanied S2562
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2562 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2562.pdf |