MA S256 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote student nutrition. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote student nutrition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H477 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H515 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S771 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H400 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1839 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S261 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S332 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S333 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1202 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3613 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
H547 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S244 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2248 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback