MA S2549 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Milton to use certain property for school purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Milton to use certain property for school purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-03-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday, March 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-02-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday February 29, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2024 from 04:00 PM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-01-16 | House | House concurred |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
Same As/Similar To
H1389 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2549 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2549.pdf |