MA S2548 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4539
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - See H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - See H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | See H4539 |
Same As/Similar To
H4539 (Replaced by) 2018-06-28 - Reported by H4670
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1687 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1291 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2576 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H840 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2615 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1687 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1291 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2576 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H840 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2615 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2548 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2548.pdf |