MA S2527 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2390
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote student nutrition, reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2527).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Education to make an investigation and study of a certain current Senate document relative to student nutrition
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Accompanied by S2390 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2390 (Replaces) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2527 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2527.pdf |