MA S2511 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 403 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 403 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a municipal services facility mitigation fund for the town of Andover. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Creating a municipal services facility mitigation fund for the town of Andover
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 403 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-01-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-01-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-01-03 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-12-15 | House | House concurred |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Committee reported that Joint Rule 7B has been complied with |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1028 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2360
H3483 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
S1967 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4173 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Text of an amendment, see S1979
H4174 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Senate concurred
H3483 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
S1967 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4173 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Text of an amendment, see S1979
H4174 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2511 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2511.pdf |