MA H3483 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4611
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require landlords to install window guards in certain residential units housing children under 10 years of age. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Enhancing child safety
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4611 |
2015-10-09 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4611 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H110 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4534
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1756 (Similar To) 2015-10-13 - Accompanied S999
H4761 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2016
H110 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4534
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1756 (Similar To) 2015-10-13 - Accompanied S999
H4761 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3483 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3483.pdf |