MA S2475 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, Thursday, July 28, 2016 - The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill pertaining to the town of Bellingham and water main easement (Senate, No. 2117),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2475).
Title
Authorizing the Commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant a water main easement to the town of Bellingham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 212 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #535 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2016-07-30 | House | Enacted 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 465) |
2016-07-30 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-07-28 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Substituted for S2117 |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2117 |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2117 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - New draft substituted, see S2475
S148 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S1943 (Similar To) 2015-06-01 - See S3
S2049 (Similar To) 2015-11-16 - Accompanied H3789
H3374 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2015
S148 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S1943 (Similar To) 2015-06-01 - See S3
S2049 (Similar To) 2015-11-16 - Accompanied H3789
H3374 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2475 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2475.pdf |