MA S148 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 13 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 13 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation (by vote of the town) to authorizing the town of Bellingham to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Bellingham to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-07-13 | House | Enacted |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-05-05 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-01-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-01-06 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-07-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/28/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2117 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - New draft substituted, see S2475
S2051 (Similar To) 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2016
S2038 (Similar To) 2015-12-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2015
S1943 (Similar To) 2015-06-01 - See S3
S2049 (Similar To) 2015-11-16 - Accompanied H3789
H4239 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Senate concurred
S2051 (Similar To) 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2016
S2038 (Similar To) 2015-12-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2015
S1943 (Similar To) 2015-06-01 - See S3
S2049 (Similar To) 2015-11-16 - Accompanied H3789
H4239 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S148 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S148.pdf |