MA S2468 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on October 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - See H4109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - See H4109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | Senate | See H4109 |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Substituted, as a new text for H4109 |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Amendment (Rodrigues) adopted |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, October 19, 2023 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Recommended new text for H4109 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4109 (Similar To) 2024-07-19 - Reported by H4890
H4890 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2024
S2484 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - See H4109
H4100 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - New draft substituted, see H4109
H1849 (Similar To) 2023-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4100
H4890 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2024
S2484 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - See H4109
H4100 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - New draft substituted, see H4109
H1849 (Similar To) 2023-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4100
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2468 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2468.pdf |