MA S2461 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-29 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-29 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To strengthen the anti-human trafficking law
Title
To strengthen the anti-human trafficking law
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending |
2016-08-29 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4595 |
2016-07-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #430 [Yeas 40 to Nays 0] |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Text of S2444, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2461 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2461.pdf |